THE FRIENDS OF SAVERNAKE HOSPITAL AND THE COMMUNITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To work to enhance the quality of life for people in the local community affected by ill health, disability or old age. Also to support the care and well being of patients/users at Savernake Hospital and other local health care facilities, local G.P. surgeries and help to improve the medical provision for these patients/users in the Marlborough area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 22 July 1971: Standard registration
- 21 October 2015: Funds received from 204001 SAVERNAKE HOSPITAL LAVINGTON FUND
- FRIENDS OF THE SAVERNAKE HOSPITAL AND THE COMMUNITY (Working name)
- THE LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF SAVERNAKE HOSPITAL (Previous name)
- THE LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF THE MARLBOROUGH HOSPITAL (Previous name)
- THE LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF THE MARLBOROUGH HOSPITALS (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JANET CAROLINE LOUTH | Chair | 30 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
ALAN PHIZACKLEA | Trustee | 12 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Marie McNally-Mills | Trustee | 28 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Keith Marshall | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lorna Hamzah | Trustee | 13 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Anne Wright | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.73k | £8.75k | £4.39k | £8.29k | £11.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £42.46k | £22.29k | £21.26k | £26.93k | £21.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 19 November 2021 | 19 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 20 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AS AMENDED 9TH MARCH 1984, 21ST MARCH 1986, 17TH MARCH 1989, 19TH MARCH 1993 AND 30TH APRIL 2003. as amended on 20 May 2010
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE PATIENTS AND FORMER PATIENTS OF THE SAVERNAKE AND MARLBOROUGH CHILDREN'S CONVALESCENT HOSPITALS WHO ARE SICK, CONVALESCENT, DISABLED, HANDICAPPED, INFIRM OR IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE AND, GENERALLY, TO SUPPORT THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE SAID HOSPITALS. (FOR DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 3 OF THE CONSTITUTION.)
Area of benefit
MARLBOROUGH
Contact information
- Address:
-
Swindon & Marlborough Nhs Trust
Savernake Hospital
MARLBOROUGH
Wiltshire
SN8 3HL
- Phone:
- 07818769121
- Email:
- info@friendsofsavernake.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window