Governing document THE FRIENDS OF SAVERNAKE HOSPITAL AND THE COMMUNITY
Charity number: 262732

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AS AMENDED 9TH MARCH 1984, 21ST MARCH 1986, 17TH MARCH 1989, 19TH MARCH 1993 AND 30TH APRIL 2003. as amended on 20 May 2010
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE PATIENTS AND FORMER PATIENTS OF THE SAVERNAKE AND MARLBOROUGH CHILDREN'S CONVALESCENT HOSPITALS WHO ARE SICK, CONVALESCENT, DISABLED, HANDICAPPED, INFIRM OR IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE AND, GENERALLY, TO SUPPORT THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE SAID HOSPITALS. (FOR DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 3 OF THE CONSTITUTION.)
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
MARLBOROUGH
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.