BRITISH CONNEMARA PONY SOCIETY LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
British Breed Society for Connemara Ponies
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Animals
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 05 August 1971: Standard registration
- ENGLISH CONNEMARA PONY SOCIETY LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alexandra Summerfield | Trustee | 24 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Amy Smith | Trustee | 26 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Evans | Trustee | 22 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Steven Strang | Trustee | 21 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Kay Gibb | Trustee | 21 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Crundall Rook | Trustee | 21 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kerry Wainwright | Trustee | 25 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Lauren Stokeld | Trustee | 25 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Anne Marjorie Harries ,The Hon. | Trustee | 01 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Cherry Caddy | Trustee | 01 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Julia Woods | Trustee | 01 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Anne Ward | Trustee | 02 December 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £52.47k | £106.89k | £64.22k | £62.10k | £63.60k | |
|
Total expenditure | £48.20k | £61.73k | £54.33k | £55.90k | £57.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 15 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 15 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 19 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 25 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 14 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 26TH MARCH 1971, AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION OF 5TH. DECEMBER 1995,AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION OF 12 NOVEMBER 2002. as amended on 25 Nov 2020
Charitable objects
The objects for which the Society is established are: - 1. to preserve and improve the standard of the Connemara pony both pure bred and part bred by breeding and importing and to further its development in Great Britain and elsewhere; 2. to provide or assist in the provision for the public benefit of facilities for recreation or other leisure time occupation through the use of ponies and horses but confined to facilities provided in the interests of social welfare within the meaning and so as to satisfy the requirements of the Charities Act 2011; and 3. to prevent cruelty to horses and ponies.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
24 Mount Pleasant Road
ALTON
GU34 1NN
- Phone:
- 0142089114
- Website:
-
britishconnemaras.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window