THE LOGOS TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Accepts gifts, donations, bequests and other income. Makes donations and loans to The Logos Educational Institute, a company registered in Cyprus, or such other body for the promotion of the Trusts objects. Establish and fund scholarships. Acquire land and buildings necessary for the furtherance of the charities objects.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

15 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Cyprus
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 04 August 1971: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
COLIN CLARKE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
JONATHAN AIKEN | Trustee | 13 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
DAVID MCCLEAN | Trustee | 19 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW ENTWISTLE | Trustee | 19 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
PAUL DAVIDSON | Trustee | 19 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
DAVID HUTCHINSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ALAN WOODSIDE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SAMUEL BROWN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DARREN WOODSIDE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DON MCQUILLAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROBERT LOVE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARSHALL HOWE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SAMUEL DAVISON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PETER ROSS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN ROSS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £62.36k | £146.57k | £142.87k | £74.07k | £72.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £133.40k | £179.92k | £247.93k | £46.06k | £122.55k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 17 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 17 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 19 July 2023 | 19 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 19 July 2023 | 19 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 21 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 04 October 2022 | 96 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 09 August 2021 | 40 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 09 August 2021 | 40 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 29 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 29 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 24TH MAY 1971
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH THE PROVISION OF SCHOOLS AND EDUCATIONAL FACILITIES THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE ALLEVIATION OF HUNGER AND DISEASE IN THE REPUBLIC OF CYPRUS AND ELSEWHERE THROUGHOUT THE WORLD AND WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING IN PARTICULAR TO FURTHER THE CHARITABLE WORK OF A CHRISTIAN INSTITUTE OF LEARNING FOR BOTH SEXES WHICH IS INTENED TO BE KNOWN AS THE LOGOS EDUCATIONAL INSTITUTE TO BE ESTABLISHED IN THE REPUBLIC OF CYPRUS AND WHICH IS INTEDED TO INCLUDE INTERALIA AND ELEMENTARY SCHOOL DEPARTMENT, A SECONDARY SCHOOL DEPARTMENT, A TECHNICAL TRAINING DEPARTMENT AND A BIBLE SCHOOL DEPARTMENT AND TO PROVIDE INTER ALIA THROUGH CLASSES INSTRUCTION LIFE AND TESTIMONY OF THE STAFF A MEANSWHEREBY YOUNG PEOPLE MAY COME TO A PERSONAL RELATIONSHIP WITH CHRIST AS SAVIOUR AND LORD.
Area of benefit
CYPRUS AND REST OF WORLD
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 Carsons Mews
Ballygowan
NEWTOWNARDS
BT23 5GA
- Phone:
- 02897521065
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window