Governing document THE EVANGELICAL FELLOWSHIP OF CONGREGATIONAL CHURCHES
Charity Number: 262802

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 05/06/1971 AS AMENDED ON 01/05/1999 AS AMENDED ON 03/05/2008 AS AMENDED ON 08/05/2010 AS AMENDED ON 12/05/2012
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE AND PROMOTE FELLOWSHIP BETWEEN EVANGELICAL CONGREGATIONAL CHURCHES; TO ADVANCE EVANGELICAL CHRISTIANITY THROUGH INDEPENDENT CHURCHES. (FOR DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 1 OF THE CONSTITUTION).
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.