Financial history THE MARINA RANGE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 262836
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £6.22k £7.97k £8.30k £9.11k £8.93k
Total expenditure £4.55k £3.62k £6.70k £12.14k £6.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A