EMERTON-CHRISTIE CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Please note that from 1st November 2021 the charity no longer accepts appeals by post. Consideration of email appeals to the trustees by charities, and the distribution of charitable donations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 13 August 1971: Standard registration
- EMERTON CHARITABLE SETTLEMENT (Previous name)
- EMERTON CHRISTIE CHARITY (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LIEUTENANT COLONEL WILLIAM DAVID NIEKIRK | Trustee |
|
||||||
Dr CLAIRE MARGARET MERA-NELSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Sally Walker | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £86.77k | £71.27k | £81.51k | £102.46k | £109.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £95.79k | £42.34k | £140.97k | £94.57k | £47.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 19 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 19 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 02 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 02 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 02 May 2023 | 86 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 02 May 2023 | 86 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 02 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 02 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 05 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 05 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SETTLEMENT DATED 1ST JANUARY 1971 AND SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 12TH APRIL 1977
Charitable objects
TO OR FOR ALL OR ANY ONE OR MORE OF THE CHARITIES SPECIFIED IN THE SECOND SCHEDULE OF THE DEED OR TO SUCH OTHER CHARITIES (BEING CHARITIES REGISTERED WITH THE COMMISSIONERS) OR FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR UNCONTROLLED DISCRETION MAY DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
18 Kirkside Road
LONDON
SE3 7SQ
- Phone:
- 07887397544
- Email:
- info@emertonchristie.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window