Financial history EAGIT LTD

Charity number: 262859
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2009 31/07/2010 31/07/2011 31/07/2012 31/07/2013
Total gross income £2.15m £2.29m £1.90m £1.72m £1.84m
Total expenditure £2.22m £2.23m £2.04m £1.74m £1.95m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £13.32k £0 £14.65k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £2.15m £2.29m £1.89m £1.72m £1.82m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £6 £0 £11
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.20m £2.21m £2.02m £1.72m £1.80m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £20.90k £20.34k £21.67k £21.64k £21.85k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £127.59k