FLAX BOURTON COMMUNITY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Financial relief to the poor and needy in the parish of Flax Bourton
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- North Somerset
Governance
- 10 September 1971: Standard registration
- CHARITY FOR A POOR HOUSE (Previous name)
- FLAX BOURTON RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Katherine Danes Falconer | Trustee | 16 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Adrienne Hughes | Trustee | 16 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
ANNA LOUISE BARR | Trustee | 19 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
HELEN HARRIS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JANE ALICIA MOSS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.73k | £1.40k | £1.56k | £1.73k | £1.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.27k | £300 | £1.82k | £2.76k | £630 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 07 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 02 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE 6TH FEBRUARY 1978 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION UNDER S74 OF THE CA93 ON 5TH NOVEMBER 1998 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 20 NOV 2019 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 20 NOV 2019
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MICHAEL AND ALL ANGELS, FLAX BOURTON WHO ARE IN NEED BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE, AND TO ADVANCE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES (ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES) AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT FROM TIME TO TIME
Area of benefit
PARISHES OF ST MICHAEL AND ALL ANGELS, FLAX BOURTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
22 PARSONS MEAD
FLAX BOURTON
BRISTOL
BS48 1UH
- Phone:
- 01275461209
- Email:
- flaxbourtonct@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window