Christ Church Bath Charitable Fund

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Making small charitable donations at the discretion of the Trustees
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Bath And North East Somerset
- Somerset
Governance
- 27 October 1971: Standard registration
- Christ Church Hall Fund (Working name)
- CHRIST CHURCH HALL (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
EMMA LOUISE ELLIOTT | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Matthew David Jones | Trustee | 25 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Robin Kerr | Trustee | 16 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
SARAH SHEPPARD | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.09k | £2.08k | £2.09k | £2.06k | £2.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.12k | £1.50k | £123 | £3.60k | £1.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 26 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 15 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 15 May 2024 | 197 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 13 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 17 November 2021 | 17 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
INDENTURE DATED 18 FEBRUARY 1890 as amended on 06 Nov 2019 as amended on 06 Nov 2019 as amended on 16 Mar 2023
Charitable objects
Such religious educational parochial or other purposes as shall in the Trustees absolute discretion seem to them conducive to the promotion of the doctrines and work of the Church of England under the ministration of the Priest in Charge of Christ Church. The education instruction improvement welfare or recreation of the said Church so that the Trust funds may be so used in connection with Christ Church as the Trustees shall think proper
Area of benefit
CHRIST CHURCH, BATH
Contact information
- Address:
-
Christ C Of E Church
Julian Road
BATH
BA1 2RH
- Phone:
- 01225 338869
- Email:
- emma@house-of-elliott.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window