LORD MEDWAY'S CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Financial donations Provision of library services
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 12 October 2021
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 11 October 1971: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Argus Edward Gathorne-Hardy Hon. | Trustee | 29 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
HON JOHN JASON GATHORNE-HARDY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
EARL OF CRANBROOK | Trustee |
|
||||||
COUNTESS OF CRANBROOK | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 12/10/2017 | 12/10/2018 | 12/10/2019 | 12/10/2020 | 12/10/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.92k | £1.87k | £1.96k | £3.31k | £2.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.69k | £1.09k | £4.27k | £2.55k | £1.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 12 October 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 271 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 12 October 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 271 days | |
Annual return | 12 October 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 637 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 12 October 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 637 days | |
Annual return | 12 October 2021 | 01 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 12 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 12 October 2020 | 23 November 2021 | 103 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 12 October 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 12 October 2019 | 06 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 12 October 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED DATED 13TH APRIL 1969
Charitable objects
TO SUCH CHARITIES OR FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AND IN SUCH PROPORTIONS AND IN SUCH MANNER AND SUBJECT TO SUCH TERMS AND CONDITIONS AS THE SETTLOR MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE, AND AFTER THE DEATH OF THE SETTLOR AS THE TRUSTEES MAY DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
GLEMHAM HOUSE
GREAT GLEMHAM
SAXMUNDHAM
IP17 1LP
- Phone:
- 01728663543
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window