THE OTTER TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
education of the public in conservation of the natural environment, with an emphasis on research and scientific study, particularly of otters.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2021
Total income includes £26,874 from 2 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
32 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Throughout England And Wales
- Brazil
- France
- Guinea-bissau
- Senegal
- Sri Lanka
- The Gambia
Governance
- 26 October 1971: Standard registration
- THE OTTER AND WILDERNESS TRUST (Previous name)
- THE OTTER TRUST (Previous name)
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Goodall | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|||||
Ian Roger Walsh | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ben Potterton | Trustee | 24 February 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £153.33k | £68.03k | £181.77k | £97.52k | £161.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £238.45k | £252.86k | £252.87k | £210.64k | £200.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | £10.00k | £26.87k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 193 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 193 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 559 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 559 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 11 April 2023 | 162 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 11 April 2023 | 162 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 12 May 2022 | 193 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 12 May 2022 | 193 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 24 November 2020 | 24 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 24 November 2020 | 24 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 24 OCTOBER 2003 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTIONS DATED 10 JULY 2004 AND 18 MARCH 2006
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN WILDLIFE AND THE CONSERVATION OF THE NATURAL ENVIRONMENT BY THE PROMOTION AND SUPPORT OF SCIENTIFIC STUDY AND RESEARCH THE RESULTS OF WHICH SHALL BE DISSEMINATED AND IN PARTICULAR BY THE PRESERVATION AND STUDY OF THE SPECIES OTTERS (LUTRINAE).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Earsham Wetland Centre
Old Harleston Road
Earsham
BUNGAY
Suffolk
NR35 2AF
- Phone:
- 07592502043
- Email:
- CONTACT@THEOTTERTRUST.ORG
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window