Governing document THE ASHFORD HOSPITAL BROADCASTING SERVICE
Charity number: 263108

Charity reporting is overdue by 669 days
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 22/09/1971 AS AMENDED ON 05/01/1972 AS AMENDED ON 24/10/1972 AS AMENDED ON 28/10/1988 AS AMENDED ON 21/10/2012 AS AMENDED ON 02/09/2013 AS AMENDED ON 13/10/2013
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE SICKNESS, INFIRMITY AND OLD AGE BY PROVIDING A LOCAL BROADCASTING SERVICE FOR PATIENTS IN HOSPITALS, SIMILAR INSTITUTIONS AND THOSE BEING CARED FOR IN THE COMMUNITY, IN THE ASHFORD BOROUGH
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
ASHFORD AND DISTRICT
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.