Financial history THE GENERAL CHURCH OF THE NEW JERUSALEM COUNCIL LIMITED

Charity number: 263121
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £63.38k £202.97k £58.65k £58.15k £63.51k
Total expenditure £51.36k £199.10k £64.82k £56.10k £54.61k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A