CLEEVE HILL CHURCH FUND

Charity number: 263136
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES CONNECTED WITH THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN ACCORDANCE WITH EVANGELICAL PRINCIPLES AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT WITH A PREFERENCE, OTHER THINGS BEING EQUAL, FOR SUCH PURPOSES IN, OR IN THE NEIGHBOURHOOD OF, CLEEVE HILL.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024

Total income: £15,023
Total expenditure: £16,110

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Accommodation/housing
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Gloucestershire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 10 August 1976: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • THE CHARITY FOR A PARSONAGE (Working name)
  • THE CLEEVE HILL CHARITIES (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investment
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Steve Casse Chair 18 October 2015
None on record
Andrew David Doel Trustee 01 November 2022
None on record
John Milroy Trustee 01 November 2022
None on record
Jan van Egmond BSc Trustee 18 October 2015
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £3.60k £4.37k £4.55k £4.70k £15.02k
Total expenditure £3.76k £11.55k £6.74k £4.43k £16.11k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 10 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2023 02 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 27 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 30 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 26 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME OF 15 JUNE 1976
Charitable objects
(A) IN OR TOWARDS PROVIDING ACCOMMODATION FOR USE AS A RESIDENCE FOR THE MINISTER OF PRIORY PARK CHURCH, TEWKESBURY. (B) IN OR TOWARDS DEFRAYING THE COST OF THE UPKEEP AND REPAIR OF SUCH ACCOMMODATION AS AFORESAID OR OF ANY OTHER PROPERTY FOR THE TIME BEING USED AS A RESIDENCE BY TH SAID MINISTER. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSES 4 AND 5 OF SCHEME).
Area of benefit
CLEEVE HILL AND NEIGHBOURHOOD
Registration history
  • 10 August 1976 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
1 Melbourne Close
Cheltenham
GL53 0JP
Phone:
01242300571
Website:

No information available