WIMBLEDON CHORAL SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the Society are to promote, improve, develop and maintain public education in and appreciation of the art and science of choral music by the presentation of public concerts and other activities involving or relating to choral music.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Surrey
- Throughout London
Governance
- 11 February 1972: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alexander James Youel | Chair | 25 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ian Alfred Gleeson | Trustee | 25 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paula Jane Lambe | Trustee | 25 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anna Lemmon | Trustee | 30 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Tracy Mary Anne Sherman | Trustee | 01 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
John Robert Gale | Trustee | 01 October 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £102.42k | £36.16k | £68.61k | £95.62k | £113.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £57.84k | £19.42k | £127.75k | £99.47k | £92.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 10 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 10 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 30 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 30 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 29 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 29 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 15 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 15 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 08 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 08 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 24TH SEPTEMBER 2001
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE SOCIETY ARE TO PROMOTE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN AND APPRECIATION OF THE ART AND SCIENCE OF CHORAL MUSIC BY THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS AND OTHER ACTIVITIES INVOLVING OR RELATING TO CHORAL MUSIC
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 13
Augustus Court
Augustus Road
London
SW19 6NA
- Phone:
- 02087859030
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window