Financial history THE J P JACOBS CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 263161
Charity reporting is up to date (1 day late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £43.02k £35.29k £36.77k £50.82k £56.61k
Total expenditure £88.08k £84.93k £137.91k £226.90k £182.03k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A