THE PUTNEY SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The promotion of the preservation, development, and improvement for the public benefit of the character and amenities of the Putney and Roehampton area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Wandsworth
Governance
- 06 December 1971: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robert George Arguile | Chair | 20 June 2016 |
|
|||||
Alison Ann Burnyeat Fishwick | Trustee | 25 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Serena Clare Binnie | Trustee | 25 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nazim Osmancik | Trustee | 25 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michael Ixer | Trustee | 27 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew John Diarmid Nicol | Trustee | 18 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Matthew Luxford | Trustee | 20 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
Judith Mary Chegwidden | Trustee | 18 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Louise Diamond | Trustee | 28 August 2011 |
|
|
||||
Dr Carolyn McMillan | Trustee |
|
||||||
Mark Adrian Poulter | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.85k | £10.48k | £10.64k | £11.87k | £11.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.84k | £10.94k | £14.72k | £11.18k | £12.65k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 25 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 11 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16TH JUNE 1971
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE PRESERVATION, DEVELOPMENT AND IMPROVEMENT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF THE CHARACTER AND AMENITIES OF THE PUTNEY AND ROEHAMPTON AREA AND PARTICULARLY OF THE LANDS AND BUILDINGS OF BEAUTY OR OF HISTORIC, ECOLOGICAL OR OTHER PUBLIC INTEREST IN THAT AREA.
Area of benefit
PUTNEY AND ROEHAMPTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
18 BURSTOCK ROAD
LONDON
SW15 2PW
- Phone:
- 02087896692
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window