THE ROYAL AIR FORCES ASSOCIATION BOGNOR REGIS BRANCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide advice, support & practical help to serving & ex-RAF personnel and their partners. Achieved through an acredited network of honorary welfare officers with branch support. To provide membership of an association of ex-RAF personnel and their spouses. Welcomes associate members who support the aims and activities of the RAF Association.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Accommodation/housing
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- West Sussex
Governance
- 23 November 1971: Standard registration
- R A F A (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephen Hill | Chair | 18 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Terry Willmer | Trustee | 23 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jayne Potter | Trustee | 23 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Hines | Trustee | 23 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Hewings | Trustee | 20 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Roger Norman | Trustee | 20 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Keith Arnold | Trustee | 15 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mike Monk | Trustee | 19 March 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.89k | £10.94k | £9.34k | £9.27k | £9.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.75k | £7.63k | £6.72k | £8.76k | £12.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 26 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 03 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 02 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SEE RAFA CORPORATE BODY 226686
Charitable objects
AS PER RAFA CORPORATE BODY 226686
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
43 Leverton Avenue
Bognor Regis
Bognor Regis
Bognor Regis
PO22 7RA
- Phone:
- 01243860990
- Email:
- Keith_a411@hotmail.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window