Financial history ORWELL OLD PEOPLE'S TRUST

Charity number: 263280
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £15.89k £16.21k £16.29k £16.84k £17.43k
Total expenditure £18.25k £7.82k £13.14k £32.76k £19.06k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A