THE WICK THEATRE COMPANY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Wick Theatre Company presents a year-round programme of community theatre productions to the general public, at the Barn Theatre in Southwick, West Sussex, and involves its members in a range of theatre skills and crafts.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
110 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- West Sussex
Governance
- 27 April 1972: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN GARLAND | Chair |
|
||||||
Michael Wells | Trustee | 14 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anthony John Brownings | Trustee | 19 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Susanne Karin Crosby | Trustee | 21 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
JULIAN BATSTONE | Trustee | 03 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dan Dryer | Trustee | 03 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Maggi Pierce | Trustee | 03 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Peter Joyce | Trustee | 12 October 2010 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.82k | £50.78k | £2.94k | £1.53k | £16.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.88k | £12.60k | £4.67k | £10.82k | £19.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 18 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 01 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 25 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 19 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 28 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 01 October 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 6TH SEPTEMBER 1971, AS AMENDED 22ND JULY 1995 AS AMENDED 18TH SEPTEMBER 2000 AND 25 SEPTEMBER 2006
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE ADVANCEMENT AND IMPROVEMENT OF GENERAL EDUCATION IN RELATION TO ALL ASPECTS OF THE ARTS OF DRAMA AND MUSIC AND THE DEVELOPMENT OF PUBLIC APPRECIATION OF SUCH ARTS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
SOUTHWICK COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
24 SOUTHWICK STREET
SOUTHWICK
BRIGHTON
BN42 4TE
- Phone:
- 07950937438
- Email:
- Petera.joyce@btopenworld.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window