THE IPSWICH SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
IPSWICH SOCIETY
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
75 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Suffolk
Governance
- 11 February 1972: Standard registration
No other names
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ADAM RAE | Trustee | 04 April 2022 |
|
|||||||||||||
Eric Dudley Benton | Trustee | 06 June 2016 |
|
|
||||||||||||
GRAHAM DOUGLAS SMITH | Trustee | 25 June 2013 |
|
|
||||||||||||
CAROLINE JANE KENNEDY MARKHAM | Trustee | 25 June 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.57k | £12.80k | £12.20k | £15.76k | £15.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.20k | £12.17k | £8.98k | £16.11k | £15.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AS AMENDED 11 NOVEMBER 1970, 3 NOVEMBER 1993 & 24 APRIL 2002. as amended on 17 Apr 2019
Charitable objects
(1) TO PROMOTE THE STUDY OF CIVIC DESIGN. (2) TO STIMULATE PUBLIC CONSCIOUSNESS AND APPRECIATION OF THE BEAUTY, HISTORY AND CHARACTER OF IPSWICH AND ITS SURROUNDINGS. (3) TO ENCOURAGE THE PRESERVATION, DEVELOPMENT AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE FEATURES WHICH GO TO MAKE PLEASING AND CONVENIENT CONDITIONS IN WHICH TO LIVE AND WORK. (4) TO PURSUE THESE ENDS BY SUCH MEANS AS MEETINGS, LECTURES, STUDY GROUPS, EXHIBITIONS AND PUBLICATIONS.
Area of benefit
IPSWICH AND ITS SURROUNDINGS
Contact information
- Address:
-
61A FONNEREAU ROAD
IPSWICH
IP1 3JN
- Phone:
- 01473226878
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window