THE OVERSEAS BUFFALOES ASSOCIATION BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The O.B.A. is established with the object of relieving by donations, distributions, assisting poor and necessitous members, widows, orphans or dependants of deceased members, to support such external, philanthropic and charitable objects at both national and local levels.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 13 January 1972: Standard registration
- THE OVERSEAS BUFFALOES ASSOCIATION RAOB (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
James Swain | Trustee | 01 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Frank Kennedy | Trustee | 11 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
PETER SPENCE | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £115 | £104 | £135 | £0 | £300 | |
|
Total expenditure | £250 | £100 | £118 | £490 | £624 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 14 November 2024 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 02 November 2022 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 20 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 1ST NOVEMBER 1971
Charitable objects
THE RELIEFOF POOR AND NECESSITOUS BRETHREN OF THE OVERSEAS BUFFALOES ASSOCIATION RAOB AND OF POOR AND NECESSITOUS WIDOWS ORPHANS OR DEPENDENTS OF DECEASED BRETHREN.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
27 FELLOW LANDS WAY
CHELLASTON
DERBY
DE73 6SW
- Phone:
- 01332731157
- Email:
- obahonsec@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window