THE FIEC (LEGACY) CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Support, advice, and resources to affiliated independent evangelical churches.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Guernsey
- Isle Of Man
- Jersey
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 17 December 1971: Standard registration
- F I E C (Working name)
- FIEC (Working name)
- THE FELLOWSHIP OF INDEPENDENT EVANGELICAL CHURCHES (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Spencer Shaw | Trustee | 17 January 2024 |
|
|||||||||
Richard Jeremy Brooks | Trustee | 01 December 2023 |
|
|||||||||
Greig Alistair Ferguson | Trustee | 01 December 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Stephen Waud | Trustee | 01 December 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Peter Campbell | Trustee | 01 December 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Mike Hitchings | Trustee | 01 December 2021 |
|
|||||||||
Colin Adams | Trustee | 01 December 2021 |
|
|||||||||
BILL JAMES | Trustee | 01 December 2019 |
|
|||||||||
John Mark Russell | Trustee | 01 December 2019 |
|
|||||||||
Ian Jones | Trustee | 01 December 2017 |
|
|||||||||
Mike Kendall | Trustee | 01 December 2014 |
|
|||||||||
REVEREND JULIAN ERIC HARDYMAN | Trustee | 01 December 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 19 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 14 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 25 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 05 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 18 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24 NOVEMBER 1971, AS AMENDED 3 APRIL 1991, 12 OCTOBER 1991, 15 APRIL 1998, 16 MAY 2005, & BY ORDER OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS DATED 13 JUNE 2005 AS AMENDED AT ANNUAL ASSEMBLY 4 APRIL 2006, 19 APRIL 2008, 24 APRIL 2010 AND 9 OCTOBER 2012 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 29 SEP 2017
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EVANGELICAL CHRISTIAN FAITH WHICH SHALL MEAN THE FAITH BASED UPON THE DOCTRINAL BASIS (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 3 OF CONSTITUTION).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
41 THE POINT
MARKET HARBOROUGH
LE16 7QU
- Phone:
- 01858434540
- Email:
- admin@fiec.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window