Trustees STUDENT COMMUNITY ACTION - VOLUNTEERS IN CAMBRIDGE (CAMBRIDGE SCA)
Charity number: 263361

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Grace Howard | Trustee | 14 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Emma Bradley | Trustee | 14 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
David Toh | Trustee | 14 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Suparna Dasgupta Ghose | Trustee | 16 February 2025 |
|
|||||
Xiao Rong Li-Yan-Hui | Trustee | 16 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Georgina Beatrice Bessie Perrott | Trustee | 05 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Abigail Reynolds | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Maria Clare Theresa Healy | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sai Liang | Trustee | 08 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
PAUL TAYLOR | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.