OXMARKET CENTRE OF ARTS LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide opportunities for artists and to provide facilities for artists to present their work to the public and for the public to have open access to the work of local artists
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £3,800 from 1 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
18 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- East Sussex
- Hampshire
- West Sussex
Governance
- 23 December 1971: Standard registration
- CHICHESTER CENTRE OF ARTS LTD (Working name)
- OXMARKET CENTRE OF ARTS (Working name)
- CHICHESTER CENTRE OF ARTS LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lucia Anna Barbato | Trustee | 10 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Kate FitzGerald | Trustee | 10 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Louise Goldsmith | Trustee | 11 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Harris | Trustee | 09 November 2023 |
|
|||||
Stephen Smith | Trustee | 09 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
LOUISE MYLES | Trustee | 07 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Martyn Bell | Trustee | 26 November 2015 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £82.83k | £112.70k | £183.45k | £113.64k | £112.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £82.84k | £70.22k | £129.86k | £125.25k | £119.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £7.00k | £3.80k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 08 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 08 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 21 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 21 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 3 NOVEMBER 1971 AS AMENDED 2 APRIL 1998 AND 8 OCTOBER 2008
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION, CULTIVATION, IMPROVEMENT AND APPRECIATION OF THE ARTS AMONGST THE COMMUNITY BY OPERATING AND MAINTAINING AN ARTS CENTRE FOR EXHIBITIONS OF ALL KINDS FOR THE PROMOTION OF VISUAL ARTS, MUSIC, POETRY, LITERATURE AND DRAMA AND CERTAIN OTHER PURPOSES ANCILLARY THERETO.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Chichester Centre of Arts
St. Andrews Court
East Street
CHICHESTER
PO19 1YH
- Phone:
- 01243779103
- Email:
- admin@oxmarket.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window