JOHN METCALFE PUBLISHING TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Publishes the Evangel of the Lord Jesus Christ for the benefit of all the world by the widespread distribution,both in the UK & abroad,of subsidised books,substantial tracts & a quarterly magazine; by preaching,teaching & lectures open to all who wish to attend & for which no collections are taken & no charge is made; by the free distribution of recorded tapes of past lectures,teaching & addresses
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 29 August 1973: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Daniel Munday | Trustee | 26 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Allan Roger Mears | Trustee | 07 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
John Young | Trustee | 20 December 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £165.47k | £588.70k | £117.96k | £739.45k | £182.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £32.21k | £55.19k | £57.84k | £97.61k | £12.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £584.58k | N/A | £700.79k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £980 | N/A | £4.78k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £3.14k | N/A | £23.00k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | £10.88k | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £354.26k | N/A | £516.84k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £55.19k | N/A | £97.61k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £4.31k | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 12 June 2024 | 43 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 12 June 2024 | 43 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 05 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 05 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 04 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 04 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 2ND JULY 1973
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH AND IN PARTICULAR TO PROMOTE THE PUBLICATION, PRINTING, USE, DISSEMINATION AND RECORDING OF RELIGIOUS WRITINGS PAPERS AND OTHER CHATTELS AND THE PUBLIC READING AND DISCUSSION OF SUCH WORKS AND THE PREACHING ..... OF THE GOSPEL OF JESUS CHRIST AS DELIVERED BY THE LORD JESUS CHRIST AND THE APOSTLES AND RECORDED IN HOLY SCRIPTURE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
JOHN METCALFE PUBLISHING TRUST
CHURCH ROAD
PENN
HIGH WYCOMBE
HP10 8LN
- Phone:
- 01494813174
- Email:
- paull@fishpartnership.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window