SADLER'S WELLS DEVELOPMENT TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance education, particularly by encouraging appreciation of the dramatic arts.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

15 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- City Of Westminster
- Islington
Governance
- 12 January 1972: Standard registration
- SADLERS WELLS DEVELOPMENT TRUST (Working name)
- SADLER'S WELLS DEVELOPMENT TRUST LTD (Working name)
- SADLER'S WELLS THEATRE APPEAL FUND LIMITED (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nigel Higgins | Chair | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Baroness Thangam Debbonaire | Trustee | 17 February 2025 |
|
|||||||
Nicholas Andrew Grace | Trustee | 23 April 2024 |
|
|||||||
Yana Peel | Trustee | 04 October 2023 |
|
|||||||
Suhair Fariha Khan | Trustee | 28 September 2022 |
|
|||||||
Nina Patel | Trustee | 28 September 2022 |
|
|||||||
Clare Jane Connor | Trustee | 28 September 2022 |
|
|||||||
Brenda Leff | Trustee | 22 February 2022 |
|
|||||||
PAUL EDWARD MULHOLLAND | Trustee | 22 February 2022 |
|
|||||||
Nicholas Bernard Basden | Trustee | 22 April 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Melissa Bethell | Trustee | 21 September 2020 |
|
|||||||
Matthew Jake Slotover | Trustee | 21 September 2020 |
|
|||||||
Maria Albonico | Trustee | 30 June 2020 |
|
|||||||
Melanie Jane Smith | Trustee | 26 February 2020 |
|
|||||||
HUMPHREY BATTCOCK | Trustee | 27 September 2017 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12 | £0 | £0 | £70 | £369 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £60 | £60 | £182 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 March 2021 | 39 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 16 NOVEMBER 1971 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 17 OCTOBER 2001,19 JUNE 2002, 27 JULY 2005 AND 17/7/13
Charitable objects
TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE ARTS OF DRAMA, OPERA, BALLET AND MUSIC IN PARTICULAR BY SUPPORTING THE SADLER'S WELLS FOUNDATION AND THE SADLER'S WELLS THEATRE IN ALL OR ANY OF THEIR OBJECTS AND ACTIVITIES AND BY SUPPLYING OR MAKING AVAILABLE ALL SUCH THINGS AS MAY BE REQUIRED FOR THE WORKS PREPARED OR PRODUCED BY OR FOR THEM THERE OR ELSEWHERE AND TO FOSTER PUBLIC INTEREST IN SUCH WORKS AND IN THE FOUNDATION AND THE THEATRE AND FOR THAT PURPOSE AND NOT OTHERWISE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
SADLERS WELLS THEATRE
ROSEBERY AVENUE
LONDON
EC1R 4TN
- Phone:
- 02078638035
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window