THE COMPASSIONATE FRIENDS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
Governance
- 18 January 1972: Standard registration
- 17 March 2004: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 17 March 2004: Funds transferred to 1082335 THE COMPASSIONATE FRIENDS
- TCF (Working name)
- THE SOCIETY OF THE COMPASSIONATE FRIENDS (Previous name)
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 24TH OCTOBER 1971 AS AMENDED 30TH JUNE 1973,18TH MAY 1974, 18TH JUNE 1988,15TH JULY 1995, 12TH SEPTEMBER 1998.
Charitable objects
TO (A) ADVANCE AND ASSIST THE RELIEF OF MENTAL AND PHYSICAL ILLNESS,SUFFERING AND INFIRMITY AMONG(1) PARENTS OCCASIONED BY THE DEATH OF THEIR CHILD OR CHILDREN(2) OTHER CLOSE RELATIVES OF THE CHILD CONCERNED,NORMALLY BROTHERS, SISTERS AND GRANDPARENTS(B)PROMOTE AND SUPPORT RESEARCH AND TO PUBLISH THE RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH INTO MEDICINE AND ROAD SAFETY AND OTHER CHILD LIFE PROTECTION PROJECTS LIKELY TO EFFECTIVELY REDUCE DEATHS AMONG CHILDREN. (C)PROVIDE EDUCATIONAL, ADVISORY AND OTHER RELATED SERVICES DESIGNED TO INCREASE AWARENESS AND SUPPORT FOR VOLUNTARY AND STATUTORY ORGANISATIONS SUPPORTING THE MENTAL AND PHYSICAL NEEDS OF SUCH PERSONS OCCASIONED BY THE DEATH OF THEIR CHILD OR CHILDREN.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.