THE MACDONALD TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity supports other charities carrying out charitable work in London (HIV positive families), Wales (with the elderly), Manchester (offenders, schools) and Norwich (teaching English).
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Coventry City
- Manchester City
- Norfolk
- Tower Hamlets
- West Sussex
Governance
- 28 May 1973: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr SIMON J F MACDONALD | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Alexandra Rose Gosling | Trustee | 01 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Thomas James Macdonald Gosling | Trustee | 25 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
FIONA E R MACDONALD BOX | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HELEN A L GOSLING | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.05k | £18.83k | £24.83k | £21.71k | £22.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.99k | £18.92k | £17.01k | £20.28k | £23.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 13 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 06 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 03 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 25 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 14TH DECEMBER 1971
Charitable objects
SUCH PUBLIC CHARITABLE OBJECTS ESTABLISHED UNDER THE LAW OF GREAT BRITAIN AS THE SETTLOR DURING HIS LIFETIME AND IN DEFAULT THEREOF AND SUBJECT THERETO THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
107 MELBOURN ROAD
ROYSTON
SG8 7DG
- Phone:
- 01763256972
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window