BUXTED ALMSHOUSES (INCLUDING BEQUEST OF LADY CATHERINE JULIA HARCOURT)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of accommodation for retired people of limited means.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- East Sussex
Governance
- 10 July 1972: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Morna Cox | Trustee | 22 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tony John Blyfield | Trustee | 21 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Elphick | Trustee | 10 July 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.00k | £8.25k | £14.96k | £22.15k | £13.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.58k | £23.75k | £12.43k | £12.61k | £11.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 17 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 January 2025 | 78 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 16 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 25TH MAY 1972
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION OF ACCOMMODATION FOR POOR PERSONS WHO HAVE LIVED OR WORKED IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT AND THEIR WIDOWS AND DEPENDENT CHILDREN.
Area of benefit
BUXTED, FRAMFIELD, MARSFIELD UCKFIELD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Hogge Place
Hurstwood Road
Buxted
UCKFIELD
East Sussex
TN22 4BB
- Phone:
- 01825890188
- Email:
- highbridgefarm@outlook.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window