NORTH STIFFORD VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
See area of Operation entry The Village Hall is used by the local community and members of the local public for Councillors Surgeries, Community events, Club activities and hired out for private parties.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £780 from 1 government contract(s)
People

2 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Thurrock
Governance
- 28 January 1972: Standard registration
- THE VILLAGE HALL (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
FATHER DAVID ROLLINS | Trustee | 20 February 2024 |
|
|||||||
VICTORIA HARTSTEAN | Trustee | 19 February 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.19k | £995 | £2.07k | £8.05k | £15.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.02k | £7.58k | £4.53k | £7.89k | £8.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £780 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 04 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 11 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 13 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 02 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 24 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 28TH SEPTEMBER 1959
Charitable objects
FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE WELFARE EDUCATION AND BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF NORTH STIFFORD IN THE COUNTY OF ESSEX AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR DISCRETION THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF NORTH STIFFORD IN THE COUNTY OF ESSEX
Contact information
- Address:
-
HIGH ROAD
GRAYS
RM16 5UQ
- Phone:
- 01375 370441
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window