ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS HILLINGDON, SLOUGH, WINDSOR , KINGSTON AND DISTRICT BRANCH

Charity number: 263515
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Subsidised veterinary treatment at our Hillingdon Clinic. Rehoming of unwanted and abandoned animals. Promotion of kindness and prevention of cruelty to animals. Promotion of responsible pet ownership. Fundraising to achieve the above activities.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Animals
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Buckinghamshire
  • Hillingdon
  • Kingston Upon Thames
  • Slough
  • Surrey
  • Windsor And Maidenhead

Governance

Registration history:
  • 30 March 1972: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • RSPCA HILLINGDON CLINIC (Working name)
  • RSPCA HILLINGDON, SLOUGH, WINDSOR AND DISTRICT BRANCH (Working name)
  • ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS HILLINGDON, SLOUGH, WINDSOR AND DISTRICT BRANCH (Previous name)
  • RSPCA HILLINGDON, SLOUGH, WINDSOR AND DISTRICT BRANCH (Previous name)
  • RSPCA SLOUGH UXBRIDGE AND DISTRICT BRANCH (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
IRENE Gwendoline HANSFORD Chair
ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS HILLINGDON, SLOUGH, WINDSOR , KINGSTON AND DISTRICT BRANCH CIO
Recently registered
Graham Martin Trustee 18 June 2020
ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS HILLINGDON, SLOUGH, WINDSOR , KINGSTON AND DISTRICT BRANCH CIO
Recently registered
Jill Correia Trustee 24 February 2020
ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS HILLINGDON, SLOUGH, WINDSOR , KINGSTON AND DISTRICT BRANCH CIO
Recently registered
SUSAN Mary BOON Trustee 29 October 2018
ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS HILLINGDON, SLOUGH, WINDSOR , KINGSTON AND DISTRICT BRANCH CIO
Recently registered
Andrew John LONGHURST Trustee 17 September 2018
ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS HILLINGDON, SLOUGH, WINDSOR , KINGSTON AND DISTRICT BRANCH CIO
Recently registered
Freda Elizabeth Longhurst Trustee 27 March 2017
HILLINGDON UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE (U3A)
Received: On time
ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS HILLINGDON, SLOUGH, WINDSOR , KINGSTON AND DISTRICT BRANCH CIO
Recently registered
JULIE ANN COLE Trustee
ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS HILLINGDON, SLOUGH, WINDSOR , KINGSTON AND DISTRICT BRANCH CIO
Recently registered

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £962.02k £1.08m £816.72k £964.90k £1.09m
Total expenditure £961.71k £941.28k £885.95k £997.24k £1.11m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £187.76k £78.14k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £73.04k £676.94k £174.62k £168.86k £218.71k
Income - Other trading activities £675.99k £243.72k £309.89k £529.52k £519.62k
Income - Charitable activities £198.50k £156.55k £330.37k £262.34k £320.87k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £14.50k £7.52k £1.85k £4.18k £24.54k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £5.76k
Income - Legacies £17.43k £147.37k £0 £22.11k £96.68k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £557.26k £520.18k £501.84k £578.95k £1.00m
Expenditure - Raising funds £404.45k £421.11k £384.11k £418.28k £22.22k
Expenditure - Governance £12.03k £15.31k £50.61k £23.13k £20.20k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £8.26k £952 £116 £0 £16.55k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £84.92k

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Own use assets £50.37k £23.44k £25.72k £44.73k £60.09k
Long-term investments £127.12k £129.45k £0 £0 £0
Other assets £666.56k £843.60k £913.97k £929.85k £817.88k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £64.42k £73.37k £87.22k £154.45k £78.81k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 18 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 18 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 26 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 26 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 27 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 27 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 18 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 18 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 05 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 05 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
16 CRESCENT PARADE
UXBRIDGE ROAD
HILLINGDON
UB10 0LG
Phone:
01895813263