Accounts and annual returns ROBERTSBRIDGE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 263528
Charity reporting is up to date (89 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 30 April 2025 89 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 04 July 2024 155 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 08 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 08 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 16 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 16 November 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 06 February 2021 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required