H SHAWDON CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 263532
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

General UK based support

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024

Total income: £13,636
Total expenditure: £16,711

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 10 February 1972: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
CHRISTOPHER SHAWDON Trustee
None on record
ERIC SHAWDON Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £10.86k £25.70k £14.44k £3.63k £13.64k
Total expenditure £5.52k £6.47k £21.81k £10.85k £16.71k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 12 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2023 29 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2022 27 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 11 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 11 August 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 22 May 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
42 KENILWORTH ROAD
LONDON
W5 3UH
Phone:
07884024863
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available