LAVINIAN CLUB
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide outings and social events for retired people living in and around Arundel, West Sussex at subsidised cost
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charitable Activities
- West Sussex
Governance
- 17 March 1972: Standard registration
- 09 March 2020: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2014 | 31/10/2015 | 31/10/2016 | 31/10/2017 | 31/10/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.83k | £2.72k | £2.95k | £2.94k | £2.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.36k | £5.90k | £2.59k | £5.03k | £3.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2018 | 31 December 2019 | 122 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2017 | 04 December 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2016 | 13 December 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2016 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 9TH DECEMBER 1971
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE WELFARE OF THE AGED IN ANY MANNER WHICH NOW IS OR HEREAFTER MAY BE DEEMED BY LAW TO BE CHARITABLE WITHIN THE BOROUGH OF ARUNDEL. THE CLUB SHALL BE NON-POLITICAL AND NON-PROFIT MAKING. NON-POLITCAL MEANS THAT THE CLUB SHALL NOT ESPOUSE THE CAUSE OF ANY POLITCAL CHARITY.
Area of benefit
BOROUGH OF ARUNDEL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window