COLLIER'S CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Loaves of bread to the children at Burford Primary School once a year to keep the tradition of The Thomas Collier Charity alive. In 1665 Thomas Collier left a legacy to buy 12 one-penny loaves each week to be distributed to the poor children after Sunday church service. Records show this continued until the turn of the 20th century. Now it is an annual event as a reminder of poverty in the past.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 18 February 1972: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter John Higgs | Chair | 05 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jennie Helena Craven | Trustee | 05 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINA EDGAR HIATT | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £42 | £43 | £44 | £45 | £176 | |
|
Total expenditure | £74 | £0 | £0 | £49 | £297 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 July 2024 | 176 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 04 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILLDATED 25T OCTOBER 1665 (PR VOL 8 PAGE 479)
Charitable objects
DISTRIBUTION OF BREAD TO THE POOR CHILDREN OF BURFORD.
Area of benefit
BURFORD
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE TOLSEY
126 HIGH STREET
BURFORD
OX18 4QU
- Phone:
- 01993 823647
- Email:
- town.clerk@burford-tc.gov.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window