THE EPPING SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
MEMBERSHIP MEETINGS AND PUBLIC MEETINGS ARE HELD DURING THE YEAR. THERE IS AN ACTIVE PROGRAMME OF PLANNING REVIEWS. THE SOCIETY'S AIMS ARE TO PRESERVE AND IMPROVE THE ENVIRONMENT AND PROMOTE THE AMENITIES OF EPPING TOWN AND THE SURROUNDING DISTRICT AN ELECTED COMMITTEE MEETS BI-MONTHLY AND ALSO COMMUNICATES ONLINE AND OFFICERS MEET AD HOC TO DISCUSS MATTERS APPROPRIATE TO ACHIEVING THESE ENDS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Essex
Governance
- 29 February 1972: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Maria Anne Carlstrom | Trustee | 18 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Diana Margaret Lowry | Trustee | 05 June 2023 |
|
|||||
Clifford Russell Mitchell | Trustee | 29 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Roger Keith Lowry | Trustee | 29 March 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.49k | £2.26k | £2.34k | £966 | £795 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.11k | £1.80k | £1.37k | £1.34k | £1.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 08 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 05 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24 JANUARY 1972 AS AMENDED ON 23 NOVEMBER 1994 as amended on 18 Mar 2024
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT FOR THE FOLLOWING PURPOSES IN THE AREA COMPRISING EPPING URBAN DISTRICT AND THE IMMEDIATE SURROUNDS, WHICH AREA SHALL HEREINAFTER BE REFERRED TO AS "THE AREA OF BENEFIT"; (A) TO STIMULATE PUBLIC INTEREST IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT; (B) TO PROMOTE STANDARDS OF PLANNING AND ARCHITECTURE IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT; (C) TO SECURE THE PRESERVATION PROTECTION DEVELOPMENT AND IMPROVEMENT OF FEATURES OF HISTORIC OR PUBLIC INTEREST IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT
Area of benefit
EPPING URBAN DISTRICT AND IMMEDIATE SURROUNDS
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Epping Society
c/o Epping Town Council
Epping Hall, St. Johns Road
EPPING
Essex
CM16 5JU
- Phone:
- 07443 224712
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window