QUAINTON RAILWAY SOCIETY LTD
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
Governance
- 16 March 1972: Standard registration
- 14 September 1992: Removed (Excepted charity)
No other names
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES DATED THE 4TH AUGUST 1969 AS AMENDED THE 14TH JANUARY 1972 AND THE 15TH APRIL 1972
Charitable objects
TO HOLD LAND AND BUILDINGS FOR USE AS A MUSEUM FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AND FOR THE EXHIBITION TO THE PUBLIC AND OF THEPRESERVATION OF LOCOMOTIVES ROLLING STOCK AND EQUIPMEN OF ALL KINDS SUCH AS WAS USED ON THE RAILWAYS OF THE UNITED KINGDON BEFORE THE COMMENCEMENT OF THE MODERNISATION OF THE RAILWAYS DURING TH LATE 1950'S INCLUDING ANY ITEM OF MORE RECENT OR FOREIGN ORIGIN IF CONSIDERED USEFUL OR DESIRABLE FOR THE CHARITABL PURPOSES CONNECCTED WITH RAILWAYS AND THE STUDY OF HISTORY OF STANDARD GAUGE RAILAYS AS THE EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.