Financial history FRIENDS OF MELKSHAM HOSPITAL AND COMMUNITY

Charity number: 263685
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £172 £18.66k £111 £101 £8.20k
Total expenditure £11.54k £10.39k £10.84k £5.08k £16.55k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A