THE L D PHILLIPS CENTENARY CHARITABLE FUND

Charity number: 263744
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The charity promotes primarily the work of the non profit making organisation SOS SaveOurSkills (www.sos-saveourskills.org) which works in the field of art,craft, culture and design and a close linked initiative African and African Caribbean Design Diaspora ( www.aacdd.org)

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024

Total income: £2,205
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England
  • Barbados

Governance

Registration history:
  • 03 May 1972: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Lawrance Phillips Trustee
None on record
KARIN BEATE PHILLIPS Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £1.39k £1.65k £1.57k £1.80k £2.21k
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 04 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2023 17 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2022 17 January 2024 346 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 23 January 2023 352 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 18 October 2021 255 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Flat 20
Hamble Court
68 Christchurch Road
BOURNEMOUTH
BH1 3PF
Phone:
07815900734