THE GRASSHOPPERS FUND

Charity number: 263802
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Advancement of and Research into Agriculture

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 October 2024

Total income: £18
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 14 April 1972: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
LORD WILLIAM LEWIS SELBORNE Trustee 01 November 2017
JOHN EDGAR MEMORIAL TRUST
Received: 10 days late
Dr MALCOLM CRABTREE Trustee
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ALL SAINTS', SIDMOUTH.
Received: On time
GILES JOHN ROWSELL Trustee
None on record
ROBERT BOWDEN Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022 31/10/2023 31/10/2024
Total gross income £2.25k £1 £6 £56 £18
Total expenditure £2.24k £0 £0 £5.00k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2024 03 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2023 18 November 2024 79 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2022 05 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2021 16 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2020 03 September 2021 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
West Stoke Farm
Old Stoke Road
Stoke Charity
Winchester
SO21 3PN
Phone:
01962760220
Website:

No information available