THE STRACHEY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trust promotes access to, and availability of, manuscripts of use to historians, biographers and other researchers, as well as assisting in the tracing of copyright holders.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 02 June 1972: Standard registration
- THE CENTRAL REGISTER OF MANUSCRIPTS (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARK LE FANU OBE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Nino Strachey | Trustee | 05 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
The Society of Authors | Trustee | 05 January 2022 |
|
|||||
Professor Alexandra Susan Harris | Trustee | 05 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
VIRGINIA NICHOLSON | Trustee | 06 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr PAUL LEVY PHD, FRSL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.31k | £3.83k | £4.78k | £4.63k | £4.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.26k | £9.75k | £10.45k | £8.70k | £12.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 01 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 14 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 09 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 28 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 07 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 11TH FEBRUARY 1972 AND SCHEME OF THE 11TH SEPTEMBER 1974
Charitable objects
THE SEARCHING OUT BY AVAILABLE MEANS OF MANUSCRIPTS AND THE ESTABLISHMENT BY MECHANICAL PROCESSES OR OTHERWISE AND THE MAINTENANCE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC OF A REGISTER OF MANUSCRIPTS SO DISCOVERED BEING A REGISTER INDICATING THE NATURE OF THE MANUSCRIPT AND WHERE IT IS KEPT OR BELIEVED TO BE KEPT AND THE ACQUISITION BY PURCHASE OR OTHERWISE OF MANUSCRIPTS OR ANY INTEREST THEREIN AND THEIR PRESERVATION AND THE PROVISION AND MAKING OF FACILITIES AND ARRANGEMENTS FOR THEIR INSPECTION AND FOR REFERENCE THERETO BY MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC ON SUCH TERMS AND SUBJECT TO SUCH CONDITIONS AS ARE REASONABLE AND PROPER.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE SOCIETY OF AUTHORS
84 DRAYTON GARDENS
LONDON
SW10 9SB
- Phone:
- 02073736642
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window