CROATIAN CHURCH TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The activities of The Croatian Charity Trust is in conjunction with the Charity objectives: Charitable purposes which advance the Roman Catholic Religion and in particular among or in connection with persons of Croat descent.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
- Croatia
Governance
- 19 April 1972: Standard registration
- The Croatian Church of Blessed Augustin Kazotic Bishp Zagreb (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Ljubomir Simunovic | Chair | 29 September 2007 |
|
|
||||
MISO MARLAIS | Trustee | 01 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rev TOMISLAV MARKIC | Trustee | 29 September 2007 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £106.25k | £108.79k | £129.52k | £108.30k | £98.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £105.54k | £107.47k | £119.96k | £120.18k | £98.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 14 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 14 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 08 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 08 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 17 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 17 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 22 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 22 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 03 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 03 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 7TH JULY 1971
Charitable objects
CHARITABLE PURPOSES WHICH ADVANCE THE ROMAN CATHOLIC RELIGION AND IN PARTICULAR AMONG OR IN CONNECTION WITH PERSONS OF CROAT DESCENT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
17 BOUTFLOWER ROAD
LONDON
SW11 1RE
- Phone:
- 02072233530
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window