FULHAM AND HAMMERSMITH HISTORICAL SOCIETY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Study of the history of Fulham & Hammersmith through talks, visits and publications.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Hammersmith And Fulham
Governance
- 06 April 1973: Standard registration
- 09 May 2025: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 09 May 2025: Funds transferred to 262396 THE FULHAM SOCIETY
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £867 | £875 | £1.11k | £812 | £1.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.29k | £1.26k | £789 | £1.77k | £1.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 201 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 201 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 09 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 13 November 2020 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AND RULES ADOPTED ON 17TH MAY 1971 AMENDED 19TH MAY 1973, 13TH NOVEMBER 1980 AND 8TH MARCH 1994
Charitable objects
(1) TO FOSTER AND ENCOURAGE THE STUDY OF LOCAL HISTORY AND ARCHAEOLOGY. (2) TO COMPILE AND PUBLISH HISTORICAL MATERIAL RELATING TO THE AREA OF THE LONDON BOROUGH OF FULHAM AND HAMMERSMITH. (2) TO ENCOURAGE INTEREST IN LOCAL HISTORY AND ARCHAEOLOGY BY MEETINGS, VISITS AND OTHER APPROPRIATE MEANS.
Area of benefit
FULHAM AND HAMMERSMITH LB
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window