THE ANGLO-NORSE SOCIETY IN LONDON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Society is a registered charity for the purpose of advancing the education of the citizens of Britain and Norway about each other's country and way of life. The Society meets approximately every three weeks from September to May at the Norwegian Embassy at 25, Belgrave Square in London. The programme includes talks by British and Norwegian speakers on a wide variety of subjects.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout London
- Norway
Governance
- 06 April 1972: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PAUL MALCOLM GOBEY | Chair | 22 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
SIR ANTHONY HERBERT EVERINGTON | Trustee | 30 May 2024 |
|
|||||
FRANCESCO SCHIASSI | Trustee | 08 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
BERIT HURST | Trustee | 17 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
SOLVEIG MAGDALENA NEPSTAD | Trustee | 30 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr WILLIAM JAMES COLES | Trustee | 30 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
KENNETH INGE SKAARBREVIK | Trustee | 07 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
CAROLYN INGRID CHRISTOPHERSEN MBE | Trustee | 31 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr ELETTRA CARBONE | Trustee | 07 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr MARIE JANET WELLS | Trustee | 01 May 2000 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £109.85k | £12.23k | £13.02k | £17.59k | £15.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.61k | £15.94k | £18.48k | £15.15k | £11.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 08 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 07 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 19 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 18 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 18 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED ON 3RD MAY 1966 AND AMENDED ON 13TH JANUARY 1972 as amended on 31 May 2018 as amended on 30 May 2024 as amended on 30 May 2024
Charitable objects
The Anglo-Norse Society is constituted, to advance the education of the citizens of the United Kingdom of Great Britain and Northern Ireland and Norwegians living in the United Kingdom of Great Britain and Northern Ireland in all aspects of the Kingdom of Norway, its people, history, language, artistic, scientific and economic life and similarly to promote the education of the citizens of Norway in all aspects of the United Kingdom. With such objects in view, the Society may: a) make available publications both in English and Norwegian, organise lectures, film shows, art exhibitions and similar functions and give advice and assistance in all matters relating to such education; b) increase and disseminate in the United Kingdom of Great Britain and Northern Ireland knowledge of Norway and the Norwegian way of life, with particular reference to its economic, social, political, historical and cultural institutions and developments and afford opportunities for the study of all aspects of Norwegian life and thought; c) grant bursaries to citizens of Norway for study in the United Kingdom and to citizens of the United Kingdom for study in Norway; d) grant bursaries for Norwegian-related studies in the United Kingdom to citizens of the United Kingdom and to those with a right to study in the United Kingdom; e) raise funds to finance these activities; f) use whatever other means to achieve the Society?s aims as the Trustees shall from time to time in their discretion determine.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE ANGLO NORSE SOCIETY
25 BELGRAVE SQUARE
LONDON
SW1X 8QD
- Phone:
- 01825 840043
- Email:
- info@anglo-norse.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window