Financial history READING CIVIC SOCIETY

Charity Number: 263959
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £3.30k £6.45k £10.58k £5.13k £23.09k
Total expenditure £2.19k £2.55k £8.20k £9.71k £12.57k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £3.50k