THE VEDIC SOCIETY OF SOUTHAMPTON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides a place for religious worship for persons of Hindu beliefs
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

16 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Southampton City
Governance
- 06 October 1972: Standard registration
- THE VEDIC SOCIETY HIMDU TEMPLE SOUTHAMPTON (Working name)
- VEDIC SOCIETY HINDU TEMPLE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sanjay Chandarana | Chair | 25 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jayanthini Mahadevan | Trustee | 23 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Manojkumar Kantilal Pachmatia | Trustee | 23 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Reenaben Jalpanbhai Patel | Trustee | 23 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Shraddha Bhatt | Trustee | 25 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
JALDIP PATEL | Trustee | 25 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
MANSUKH PIPALIA | Trustee | 25 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jalpanbhai Hasmukhbhai Patel | Trustee | 25 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Meten Kishore Lakhani | Trustee | 25 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
SANJAY DAVDA | Trustee | 25 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Riva Kumar Kaimal | Trustee | 25 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarika Chandarana | Trustee | 25 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Bhasker Rai Pravinchandra Dave | Trustee | 02 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
PRAVIN PATEL | Trustee | 02 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Latha Davda | Trustee | 29 March 2019 |
|
|||||
AVINAS R PATEL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £106.74k | £61.87k | £91.48k | £123.35k | £188.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £83.42k | £62.88k | £37.37k | £101.76k | £167.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 28 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 28 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 27 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 27 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 10 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 10 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 10 April 2022 | 222 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 10 April 2022 | 222 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 13 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 13 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 31ST AUGUST 1972 AS AMENDED 29TH NOVEMBER 1980 AND 25 MARCH 2007.
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE HINDU RELIGION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Vedic Society Hindu Temple
79 - 195 Radcliffe Road
Northam
SOUTHAMPTON
SO14 0PS
- Phone:
- 023 8063 2275
- Email:
- secretary@vedicsociety.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window