Trustees THE ROUGHLEY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 264037
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MARTIN CHRISTOPHER GEOFFREY SMITH Chair 01 October 1985
THE MARTANN TRUST
Received: On time
Rosanna Amina Maria Ghinai Trustee 29 November 2024
None on record
Gillian Ball Trustee 08 December 2023
None on record
Caroline Ward Trustee 01 April 2019
None on record
Camilla Newton Trustee 01 January 2019
None on record
Rachel Anna Richards Trustee 01 October 2015
None on record
Benjamin Mark Newton Trustee 01 October 2015
None on record
VERITY EMMA OWEN Trustee 01 October 2015
THE MARTANN TRUST
Received: On time