Governing document THE RUBY AND WILL GEORGE TRUST
Charity number: 264042

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SETTLEMENT DATED 21ST FEBRUARY 1966 AS AMENDED 20TH NOVEMBER 1975, 4TH APRIL 1993 AND BY SCHEME DATED 15TH MAY 1992 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 31 JULY 2010
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OR THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AMONG PERSONS FORMERLY EMPLOYED IN COMMERCE OR THE HUSBANDS WIVES WIDOWERS OR ISSUE OF SUCH PERSONS.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.